LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2017-2018 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2848
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2848
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2017-2018 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2848
Action History
Assembly
05/09/2018
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Assembly
05/03/2018
Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
Assembly
05/02/2018
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
Assembly
03/22/2018
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
Assembly
02/17/2018
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
Assembly
02/16/2018
Read first time. To print.