Senate
|
08/28/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2018
|
Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 5874.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2018
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2018
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2018
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5535.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2018
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2018
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2018
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|