|
09/10/2018
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2018
|
Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2018
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2018
|
Action rescinded whereby bill was ordered to enrollment and whereby the bill was enrolled and presented to the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2018
|
Returned by the Governor at the request of the Assembly.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/09/2018
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 58. Noes 19. Page 6208.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/05/2018
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/05/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 9. Page 5103.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 13).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2018
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/17/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 21. Page 5203.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2018
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 5094.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2018
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|