California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2864 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2018

Enrolled

Bill August 23, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 8, 2018

Amended

Bill May 25, 2018
Bill April 24, 2018
Bill April 2, 2018