|
09/27/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 825, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2018
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 60. Noes 9. Page 6376.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2018
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 16 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 4. Page 5293.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2018
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 59. Noes 1. Page 4932.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2018
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4820.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|