California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB289 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-Assembly Bill No. 289 CHAPTER 106 An act to add Section 8570.4 to the Government Code, relating to state government. [ Approved by Governor July 24, 2017. Filed with Secretary of State July 24, 2017. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 289, Gray. Office of Emergency Services: State Emergency Plan: update.The California Emergency Services Act requires the Governor to coordinate the State Emergency Plan and any programs necessary for the mitigation of the effects of an emergency in this state, as specified. That act also required the Office of Emergency Services to update the State Emergency Plan by July 31, 2015, to include proposed best practices for local governments and nongovernmental entities to use to mobilize and evacuate people with disabilities, and others with access and functional needs, during an emergency or natural disaster. This bill would require the Office of Emergency Services to update the State Emergency Plan on or before January 1, 2019, and every 5 years thereafter.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY Appropriation: NO Fiscal Committee: YES Local Program: NO Bill TextThe people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 8570.4 is added to the Government Code, to read:8570.4. The Office of Emergency Services shall update the State Emergency Plan on or before January 1, 2019, and every five years thereafter.
1+Enrolled July 06, 2017 Passed IN Senate July 03, 2017 Passed IN Assembly April 20, 2017 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 289Introduced by Assembly Member GrayFebruary 02, 2017 An act to add Section 8570.4 to the Government Code, relating to state government. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 289, Gray. Office of Emergency Services: State Emergency Plan: update.The California Emergency Services Act requires the Governor to coordinate the State Emergency Plan and any programs necessary for the mitigation of the effects of an emergency in this state, as specified. That act also required the Office of Emergency Services to update the State Emergency Plan by July 31, 2015, to include proposed best practices for local governments and nongovernmental entities to use to mobilize and evacuate people with disabilities, and others with access and functional needs, during an emergency or natural disaster. This bill would require the Office of Emergency Services to update the State Emergency Plan on or before January 1, 2019, and every 5 years thereafter.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY Appropriation: NO Fiscal Committee: YES Local Program: NO Bill TextThe people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 8570.4 is added to the Government Code, to read:8570.4. The Office of Emergency Services shall update the State Emergency Plan on or before January 1, 2019, and every five years thereafter.
22
3- Assembly Bill No. 289 CHAPTER 106 An act to add Section 8570.4 to the Government Code, relating to state government. [ Approved by Governor July 24, 2017. Filed with Secretary of State July 24, 2017. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 289, Gray. Office of Emergency Services: State Emergency Plan: update.The California Emergency Services Act requires the Governor to coordinate the State Emergency Plan and any programs necessary for the mitigation of the effects of an emergency in this state, as specified. That act also required the Office of Emergency Services to update the State Emergency Plan by July 31, 2015, to include proposed best practices for local governments and nongovernmental entities to use to mobilize and evacuate people with disabilities, and others with access and functional needs, during an emergency or natural disaster. This bill would require the Office of Emergency Services to update the State Emergency Plan on or before January 1, 2019, and every 5 years thereafter.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY Appropriation: NO Fiscal Committee: YES Local Program: NO
3+ Enrolled July 06, 2017 Passed IN Senate July 03, 2017 Passed IN Assembly April 20, 2017 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 289Introduced by Assembly Member GrayFebruary 02, 2017 An act to add Section 8570.4 to the Government Code, relating to state government. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 289, Gray. Office of Emergency Services: State Emergency Plan: update.The California Emergency Services Act requires the Governor to coordinate the State Emergency Plan and any programs necessary for the mitigation of the effects of an emergency in this state, as specified. That act also required the Office of Emergency Services to update the State Emergency Plan by July 31, 2015, to include proposed best practices for local governments and nongovernmental entities to use to mobilize and evacuate people with disabilities, and others with access and functional needs, during an emergency or natural disaster. This bill would require the Office of Emergency Services to update the State Emergency Plan on or before January 1, 2019, and every 5 years thereafter.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY Appropriation: NO Fiscal Committee: YES Local Program: NO
4+
5+ Enrolled July 06, 2017 Passed IN Senate July 03, 2017 Passed IN Assembly April 20, 2017
6+
7+Enrolled July 06, 2017
8+Passed IN Senate July 03, 2017
9+Passed IN Assembly April 20, 2017
10+
11+ CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION
412
513 Assembly Bill No. 289
6-CHAPTER 106
14+
15+Introduced by Assembly Member GrayFebruary 02, 2017
16+
17+Introduced by Assembly Member Gray
18+February 02, 2017
719
820 An act to add Section 8570.4 to the Government Code, relating to state government.
9-
10- [ Approved by Governor July 24, 2017. Filed with Secretary of State July 24, 2017. ]
1121
1222 LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST
1323
1424 ## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST
1525
1626 AB 289, Gray. Office of Emergency Services: State Emergency Plan: update.
1727
1828 The California Emergency Services Act requires the Governor to coordinate the State Emergency Plan and any programs necessary for the mitigation of the effects of an emergency in this state, as specified. That act also required the Office of Emergency Services to update the State Emergency Plan by July 31, 2015, to include proposed best practices for local governments and nongovernmental entities to use to mobilize and evacuate people with disabilities, and others with access and functional needs, during an emergency or natural disaster. This bill would require the Office of Emergency Services to update the State Emergency Plan on or before January 1, 2019, and every 5 years thereafter.
1929
2030 The California Emergency Services Act requires the Governor to coordinate the State Emergency Plan and any programs necessary for the mitigation of the effects of an emergency in this state, as specified. That act also required the Office of Emergency Services to update the State Emergency Plan by July 31, 2015, to include proposed best practices for local governments and nongovernmental entities to use to mobilize and evacuate people with disabilities, and others with access and functional needs, during an emergency or natural disaster.
2131
2232 This bill would require the Office of Emergency Services to update the State Emergency Plan on or before January 1, 2019, and every 5 years thereafter.
2333
2434 ## Digest Key
2535
2636 ## Bill Text
2737
2838 The people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 8570.4 is added to the Government Code, to read:8570.4. The Office of Emergency Services shall update the State Emergency Plan on or before January 1, 2019, and every five years thereafter.
2939
3040 The people of the State of California do enact as follows:
3141
3242 ## The people of the State of California do enact as follows:
3343
3444 SECTION 1. Section 8570.4 is added to the Government Code, to read:8570.4. The Office of Emergency Services shall update the State Emergency Plan on or before January 1, 2019, and every five years thereafter.
3545
3646 SECTION 1. Section 8570.4 is added to the Government Code, to read:
3747
3848 ### SECTION 1.
3949
4050 8570.4. The Office of Emergency Services shall update the State Emergency Plan on or before January 1, 2019, and every five years thereafter.
4151
4252 8570.4. The Office of Emergency Services shall update the State Emergency Plan on or before January 1, 2019, and every five years thereafter.
4353
4454 8570.4. The Office of Emergency Services shall update the State Emergency Plan on or before January 1, 2019, and every five years thereafter.
4555
4656
4757
4858 8570.4. The Office of Emergency Services shall update the State Emergency Plan on or before January 1, 2019, and every five years thereafter.