|
09/14/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 396, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/14/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2018
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6377.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2018
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 16 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 5267.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2018
|
(Received pursuant to Joint Rule 61(b)(14).)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 3).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2018
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2018
|
Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5168.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/12/2018
|
Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|