Senate | 08/06/2018 | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Galgiani. | ||
Senate | 08/06/2018 | From Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 07/03/2018 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 07/02/2018 | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/21/2018 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 06/12/2018 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2018 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Senate | 04/26/2018 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 04/26/2018 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4901.) | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2018 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 18). | ||
Assembly | 04/05/2018 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 21. Noes 0.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2018 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2018 | Read first time. To print. |