Assembly | 04/24/2018 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 04/17/2018 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. | ||
Assembly | 03/20/2018 | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 03/19/2018 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/19/2018 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2018 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2018 | Read first time. To print. |