California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2928 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2018

Enrolled

Bill August 24, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 17, 2018

Amended

Bill June 14, 2018
Bill March 19, 2018