Assembly | 04/26/2018 | From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | ||
Assembly | 04/24/2018 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage. | ||
Assembly | 04/10/2018 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. | ||
Assembly | 04/04/2018 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 04/03/2018 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/08/2018 | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2018 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2018 | Read first time. To print. |