Senate | 07/03/2018 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 06/20/2018 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 06/20/2018 | Withdrawn from committee. | ||
Senate | 06/13/2018 | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD. | ||
Senate | 06/04/2018 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2018 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 15. Page 5629.) | ||
Assembly | 05/03/2018 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2018 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (May 1). | ||
Assembly | 04/11/2018 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. | ||
Assembly | 04/03/2018 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 03/08/2018 | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and P. & C.P. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2018 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2018 | Read first time. To print. |