Assembly | 05/25/2018 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/25/2018 | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 5298.) | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2018 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2018 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (May 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/17/2018 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | ||
Assembly | 03/08/2018 | Referred to Coms. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. and REV. & TAX. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2018 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2018 | Read first time. To print. |