LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2017-2018 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2944
Draft Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2944
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2017-2018 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2944
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
February 16, 2018
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
August 22, 2018
Compare
Chaptered
Bill
September 17, 2018
Compare
Amended
Bill
June 14, 2018
Compare
Bill
May 31, 2018
Compare
Bill
April 16, 2018
Compare
Bill
April 2, 2018
Compare