|
09/23/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 258, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2017
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2918.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2017
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2350.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2017
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/19/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/18/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (July 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1544.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2017
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on C. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on C. & C. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2017
|
Referred to Com. on C. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/07/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 9.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/06/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|