California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2958 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2018

Enrolled

Bill September 4, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2018

Amended

Bill August 24, 2018
Bill August 6, 2018
Bill June 18, 2018
Bill April 25, 2018
Bill April 12, 2018