California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2963 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2018

Enrolled

Bill September 4, 2018

Amended

Bill August 23, 2018
Bill June 21, 2018
Bill April 11, 2018
Bill March 22, 2018