|
09/26/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 778, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/26/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2018
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6723.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2018
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5514.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2018
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2018
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2018
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/17/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5217.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/22/2018
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|