|
09/01/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 186, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2017
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2178.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/11/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2017
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 1616.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/07/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 9.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/06/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|