Assembly | 05/31/2018 | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 30. Noes 35. Page 5655.). | ||
Assembly | 05/03/2018 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2018 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/01/2018 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (May 1). | ||
Assembly | 04/02/2018 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 03/22/2018 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/22/2018 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2018 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2018 | Read first time. To print. |