Assembly | 05/23/2018 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2018 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2018 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 04/17/2018 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/12/2018 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2018 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2018 | Read first time. To print. |