Assembly | 05/25/2018 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2018 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2018 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 05/10/2018 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2018 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 9). | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2018 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (May 7). Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. | ||
Assembly | 04/30/2018 | (pending re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D.) | ||
Assembly | 04/30/2018 | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 4924.) | ||
Assembly | 04/30/2018 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 04/16/2018 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 03/12/2018 | Referred to Coms. on REV. & TAX. and H. & C.D. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2018 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2018 | Read first time. To print. |