Senate
|
06/27/2018
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2018
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2018
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 42. Noes 29. Page 5562.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2018
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2018
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 17).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2018
|
(pending re-referral to Com. on P.& C.P.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2018
|
Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 4520.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2018
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & F. and P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|