LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2017-2018 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB303
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB303
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2017-2018 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB303
Action History
Assembly
02/01/2018
From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Assembly
01/31/2018
Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
Assembly
03/28/2017
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Assembly
02/13/2017
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
Assembly
02/07/2017
From printer. May be heard in committee March 9.
Assembly
02/06/2017
Read first time. To print.