|
09/28/2018
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2018
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 13. Page 6073.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2018
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2018
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 23. Page 5122.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/22/2018
|
Referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|