06/28/2017 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 32, Statutes of 2017. | |||
06/28/2017 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Assembly | 06/16/2017 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. | ||
Assembly | 06/12/2017 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 06/12/2017 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1487.). | ||
Senate | 06/07/2017 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/06/2017 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 6). | ||
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2017 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 03/20/2017 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 647.) | ||
Assembly | 03/14/2017 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 14). | ||
Assembly | 03/13/2017 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 03/09/2017 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/07/2017 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 9. | ||
Assembly | 02/06/2017 | Read first time. To print. |