California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB3089 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2018

Enrolled

Bill September 5, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 20, 2018

Amended

Bill August 24, 2018
Bill August 21, 2018
Bill May 25, 2018
Bill April 2, 2018
Bill March 20, 2018