Senate | 06/11/2018 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 06/11/2018 | Withdrawn from committee. | ||
Senate | 06/07/2018 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 05/03/2018 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 04/23/2018 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 04/23/2018 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4828.) | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2018 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Assembly | 04/17/2018 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 17). | ||
Assembly | 04/02/2018 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 03/22/2018 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2018 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2018 | Read first time. To print. |