|
09/19/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 553, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/19/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2018
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 7036.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2018
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5996.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2018
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2018
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2018
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5133.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/12/2018
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|