California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB3112 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2018

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 20, 2018

Amended

Bill August 17, 2018
Bill July 3, 2018