California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB3115 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2018

Enrolled

Bill September 5, 2018

Amended

Bill August 28, 2018
Bill August 24, 2018
Bill June 18, 2018
Bill April 30, 2018
Bill March 19, 2018