Assembly | 04/24/2018 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. | ||
Assembly | 04/10/2018 | Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. | ||
Assembly | 04/09/2018 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/03/2018 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 03/12/2018 | Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2018 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2018 | Read first time. To print. |