California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB3119 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2018

Amended

Bill June 20, 2018
Bill May 25, 2018
Bill April 18, 2018
Bill March 22, 2018