California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB3141 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2018

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 18, 2018

Amended

Bill August 21, 2018
Bill June 18, 2018
Bill April 25, 2018