Assembly | 05/09/2018 | From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | ||
Assembly | 04/10/2018 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage. | ||
Assembly | 04/02/2018 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 03/20/2018 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 03/19/2018 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/15/2018 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2018 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2018 | Read first time. To print. |