|
09/27/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 833, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2018
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6898.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2018
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6773.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2018
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5894.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2018
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2018
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2018
|
Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5609.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5600.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2018
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2018
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5552.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2018
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 5298.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2018
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/15/2018
|
Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|