California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB3189 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2018

Enrolled

Bill August 22, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2018

Amended

Bill May 30, 2018
Bill April 19, 2018
Bill March 15, 2018