Senate
|
08/16/2018
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2018
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/05/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2018
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2018
|
Referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 26. Page 5630.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2018
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 5363.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2018
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2018
|
Re-referred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and B. & F. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/22/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/22/2018
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & F. and P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|