Assembly | 05/25/2018 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2018 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2018 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 05/01/2018 | Re-referred to Com. on V.A. | ||
Assembly | 04/30/2018 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/26/2018 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on V.A. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 23). | ||
Assembly | 04/16/2018 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 03/15/2018 | Referred to Coms. on REV. & TAX. and V.A. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2018 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2018 | Read first time. To print. |