California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB3211 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2018

Enrolled

Bill August 24, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 6, 2018

Amended

Bill July 5, 2018
Bill June 25, 2018
Bill April 12, 2018
Bill March 22, 2018