Assembly | 05/25/2018 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2018 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2018 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/10/2018 | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | ||
Assembly | 04/09/2018 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/12/2018 | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2018 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2018 | Read first time. To print. |