Senate | 08/06/2018 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 06/28/2018 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 06/20/2018 | Referred to Com. on L. & I.R. | ||
Senate | 06/13/2018 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2018 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 19. Page 5643.) | ||
Assembly | 05/25/2018 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/25/2018 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 25). | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2018 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/19/2018 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/12/2018 | Referred to Com. on L. & E. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2018 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2018 | Read first time. To print. |