California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB3246 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2018

Enrolled

Bill August 10, 2018

Chaptered

Bill August 24, 2018

Amended

Bill June 11, 2018
Bill April 2, 2018