|
06/28/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 58, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:45 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2018
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4664.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 6).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2018
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 5258.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2018
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/22/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|