|
10/05/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 491, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
10/05/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/18/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2017
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 67. Noes 5. Page 3104.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2017
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2514.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/17/2017
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/11/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 0. Page 1525.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2017
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2017
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2017
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/08/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 10.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/07/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|