Senate | 07/10/2017 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 07/03/2017 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | ||
Senate | 06/27/2017 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Referred to Com. on T. & H. | ||
Senate | 04/17/2017 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 04/06/2017 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 962.) | ||
Assembly | 03/29/2017 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 03/28/2017 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (March 27). | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2017 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 02/08/2017 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 10. | ||
Assembly | 02/07/2017 | Read first time. To print. |