|
09/21/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 643, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/21/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2018
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6822.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2018
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2018
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5439.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2018
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2018
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2017
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on P.E. & R. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 41. Noes 30. Page 1547.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on V.A. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2017
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Coms. on V.A. and P.E., R., & S.S. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/30/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/22/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2017
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/09/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 11.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/08/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|