|
10/06/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 524, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
10/06/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/25/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/14/2017
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 1. Page 3393.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/14/2017
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/13/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2851.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2017
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 2. Page 1419.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/29/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2017
|
Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/09/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 11.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/08/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|