|
01/12/2018
|
Stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
01/03/2018
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2017
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/26/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/15/2017
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/15/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2990.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/15/2017
|
Art. IV, Sec. 8(b)(1) of the Constitution dispensed with. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2989.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/15/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/15/2017
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/15/2017
|
(Ayes 24. Noes 11. Page 2944.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/15/2017
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2017
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2017
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2017
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1486.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on U. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2017
|
Referred to Com. on U. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/06/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 5.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/05/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|