California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB360 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 8, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 5, 2017

Chaptered

Bill October 2, 2017

Amended

Bill May 3, 2017
Bill March 21, 2017